whispers in the corridors
Promotion orders issued after several years of retirement
The CBIC issued three retired officers in the first week of September this year whereas they retired between 2o16 to 2019. Milind P Damle retired in March 2019. He has been given ad-hoc promotion of Dy Commissioner w e f December 10, 2006 and order issued on Sept 4, 2024. The Second case is related to D. Sam Sunder Raj. He has been given ad-hoc promotion to Asstt Commissioner w e f Feb 23, 2017, just five months before his retirement but his lollipop order was issued on Sept. 3, this year. In the third case, Hari M.P. has been given the ad-hoc promotion, effective from Oct 22, 2014 but his Asstt Commissioner order was issued on Sept 3, 2024. He also retired in May 2018 as Suppdtt, Custom.
Send Feedback
More Bureaucracy News
- Sanjay Shirsat appointed Chairman, CIDCO (UPDATED)
- PFC receives notable recognition for contribution to renewable energy sector (UPDATED)
- Parth Gautam relieved to join as PS to Education Minister (UPDATED)
- Pavitra Kumar relieved to join PS to Minister, Cooperation (UPDATED)
- Mahesh Gopinath Jiwade relieved to join as PS to Minister, New & Renewable Energy (UPDATED)
- Two IAS officers get new responsibilities in Assam (UPDATED)
- 15 IPS officers get new responsibilities in Patna
- AYUSH Ministry advertises multiple posts
- Director AIIA, New Delhi post advertised
- IT & Data Analysts sought for MSME Budget Division
- Member NCDRC vacancy uploaded by DoCA
- Police Comm, UNMISS, South Sudan post announced
- President’s Medal for R-Day 2025 recommendations invited
- Director (Infra), DFCCIL post advertised for New Delhi
- Last date to apply for GM/AGM (Mech) is Oct 15
- Post of Dy CMRS advertised for New Delhi
- UPSC releases ESE-Mains, 2024 interview schedule
- Navy to finalize three defence deals valued at ₹1.25 lakh crore in current fiscal year
- Brazilian delegation visiting India, sale of combat aircrafts on the table
- Alok Bihari Agarwal transferred to NCR
- Dr. Namita Negi is ED, Health (G), Railway Board
- Dr. Ashutosh Garg moved as Director (Health Policy & Projects), Railway Board
- Jayant Kumar appointed EDME (Modernisation & Development), Railway Board
- Manoj Garg is also Vice Chairman, RLDA
- Tatung Padi appointed as PS to Pabitra Margherita
- Nishant Mehra appointed as OSD to Prataprao Jadhav
- M J Chetan appointed as OSD to Steel Minister
- 35 officers of Central Health Service promoted to HAG
- SCSC selects B K Das for Director (Fin), UCIL
- Jitendra Raje is back to Sikkim
- Is the CP, Kolkata main point of tussle and impasse?
- If Mamata quits, some bureaucrats may follow her